TN SB0272 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that machinery, equipment, and associated parts used by the department of general services or a contracted entity for the Megasite Authority of West Tennessee is included in the definition of "industrial machinery" for purposes of sales and use taxes. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-102.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-6-102, relative to industrial machinery.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommend for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2023 | |
2023-03-28 | Pub. Ch. 53 | |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-03-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-03-06 | House | Passed H., Ayes 98, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/6/2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/28/2023 |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means with recommendation |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2023-01-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0320 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-28 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 53