TN SB0316 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, designates September 14 of each year as "Star-Spangled Banner Day," a day of special observance. - Amends TCA Title 15, Chapter 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 15, Chapter 2, relative to Star-Spangled Banner Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/20/2021 | |
2021-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 167 | |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-05 | House | Passed H., Ayes 85, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2021-04-05 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-03-11 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1543 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 167