TN SB0381 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the termination provision for the title addressing the COVID-19 pandemic, which would have terminated July 1, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 14; Title 29; Title 38; Title 49; Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 9; Title 14; Title 29; Title 38; Title 49; Title 50; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to public health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/15/2023 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0836 (Crossfiled) 2023-01-30 - Withdrawn.