TN SB0436 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 191
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Pub. Ch. 191
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases the maximum amount of the fee local governments may charge for a false alarm from $25.00 to $50.00. - Amends TCA Title 62.
Title
As enacted, increases the maximum amount of the fee local governments may charge for a false alarm from $25.00 to $50.00. - Amends TCA Title 62.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Pub. Ch. 191 |
2013-04-29 | House | Effective date(s) 04/23/2013 |
2013-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-04-11 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-10 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-04-10 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-10 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2013-04-10 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0179) |
2013-04-10 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 26, Nays 4 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0132) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/4/2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/4/2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/21/2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/13/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/13/2013 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0263 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 191