TN SB0620 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-27 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Families' Rights and Responsibilities Act," which declares that the ability of a parent to direct the upbringing, education, health care, and mental health of that parent’s child is a fundamental right. - Amends TCA Title 36 and Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36 and Title 49, relative to the "Families' Rights and Responsibilities Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/27/2024 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/27/2024 |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 1/9/2024 |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1414 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee