TN SB0841 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits prosecution for crimes in title 39, chapter 17, part 4, if the prosecution is based on evidence acquired as a result of a person seeking emergency medical assistance for someone experiencing a drug-related overdose. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Title
As introduced, prohibits prosecution for crimes in title 39, chapter 17, part 4, if the prosecution is based on evidence acquired as a result of a person seeking emergency medical assistance for someone experiencing a drug-related overdose. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4.
Sponsors
Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0771 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0841&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0841.pdf |