TN SB1286 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes a credit union with a state charter to purchase a participation interest in a loan from a bank, another credit union, or another eligible organization, without requiring membership of the borrower of the loan. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 39; Title 45; Title 47 and Title 48.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 39; Title 45; Title 47 and Title 48, relative to financial institutions.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Bailey [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2024 | |
2024-05-09 | Pub. Ch. 803 | |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 83, Nays 0, PNV 4 |
2024-04-11 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0799) |
2024-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0715) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2024 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/20/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1062 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 803