TN SB1663 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 983
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 983
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to regulation of prescription drugs; prohibits health care prescribers from dispensing opioids and benzodiazepines, with certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 53 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes to regulation of prescription drugs; prohibits health care prescribers from dispensing opioids and benzodiazepines, with certain exceptions. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17, Part 4; Title 53 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-03 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 983 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Effective date(s) 01/01/2015 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1327) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1148) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1139) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1045) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/15/2014 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/10/2014 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/9/2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/2/2014 |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 4/1/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/26/2014 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm. |
2014-01-16 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1512 (Crossfiled) 2014-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 983