TN SB1663 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the requirement for registers of deeds to remit 52 percent of their commission for the collection of the recordation tax to the state treasurer. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 4, relative to commissions retained by registers of deeds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2022 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 1/25/2022 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-11-17 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1647 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee