TN SB1838 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, under certain circumstances, authorizes eligible taxpayers that expand headquarters facilities, make additional capital investments, and create new jobs, to qualify for a sales and use tax credit on purchases of personal property used in the facility. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4; Section 67-6-224 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Title
As introduced, under certain circumstances, authorizes eligible taxpayers that expand headquarters facilities, make additional capital investments, and create new jobs, to qualify for a sales and use tax credit on purchases of personal property used in the facility. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4; Section 67-6-224 and Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 3.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Tax Sub Comm. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to 3/18/2014 |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 3/11/2014 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. |
2014-01-23 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1835 (Crossfiled) 2014-02-04 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB1838&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/SB1838.pdf |