TN SB1842 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/11/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-19 - Effective date(s) 03/11/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires clerks of circuit court, criminal court, general sessions courts, other special courts created by law, and municipal courts exercising concurrent general sessions jurisdiction, to notify the Tennessee bureau of investigation of the final disposition in criminal proceedings within three business days of the disposition, rather than 72 hours. - Amends TCA Title 16, Chapter 18 and Title 18, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 16, Chapter 18 and Title 18, Chapter 4, relative to notification to the Tennessee bureau of investigation of final disposition of criminal proceedings.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Effective date(s) 03/11/2024 | |
2024-03-19 | Pub. Ch. 554 | |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-02-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-02-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-02-22 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/22/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2053 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 554