TN SB1888 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the coordinated school health program to submit a mid-year report to the department of education to determine if funds within the program should be redistributed. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 1, Part 10, relative to coordinated school health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-05-02 | Pub. Ch. 913 | |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-04-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-11 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0881) |
2022-04-11 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2022-04-11 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0862) |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/11/2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/16/2022 |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1891 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 913