TN SB2066 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/19/2024, 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective date(s) 04/19/2024, 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires each child care agency in this state to have installed in each room of the child care agency where care is provided to children a carbon monoxide alarm that is listed according to the International Building Code and International Fire Code for the purpose of carbon monoxide detection; provides that a violation is a Class C misdemeanor and that each day on which a violation continues constitutes a separate offense. - Amends TCA Title 68, Chapter 120 and Title 71, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 68, Chapter 120 and Title 71, Chapter 3, relative to carbon monoxide alarms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Effective date(s) 04/19/2024, 07/01/2024 | |
2024-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 733 | |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-04 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2024-04-04 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0688) |
2024-04-04 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-03-04 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 26, Nays 0 |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0553) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 2/29/2024 |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 2/21/2024 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1969 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 733