TN SB2073 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the current moratorium on the issuance of certificates of need for new nursing home and skilled nursing facility beds until June 30, 2017. - Amends TCA Section 68-11-1609 and Section 68-11-1622.
Title
As introduced, extends the current moratorium on the issuance of certificates of need for new nursing home and skilled nursing facility beds until June 30, 2017. - Amends TCA Section 68-11-1609 and Section 68-11-1622.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/16/2016 |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1655 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2073&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB2073.pdf |