TN SB2118 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-11 - Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 06/11/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-06-11 - Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 06/11/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, designates certain counties containing areas designated as economically distressed by the federal government as tier 3 economically distressed counties for job tax credit purposes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Title
As introduced, designates certain counties containing areas designated as economically distressed by the federal government as tier 3 economically distressed counties for job tax credit purposes. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-11 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 06/11/2009 | |
2009-06-10 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 06/10/2009 | |
2009-06-08 | Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2009-06-04 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 06/08/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Action Def. in S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. to next cal. | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2009-03-02 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2009-02-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2198 (Crossfiled) 2010-05-26 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2118&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2118.pdf |