TN SB2122 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows an LEA or public charter school to elect not to receive a letter grade for one or more of its schools by notifying the commissioner of education, in writing, of its decision to opt out of such requirements; allows, instead of requires, an LEA or public charter school to retain certain students in fourth grade if the student's LEA or public charter school determines that retention may benefit the student. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to K-12 education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2238 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-26 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education Administration