TN SB2437 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-20 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-20 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the court to include in any parenting plan involving shared custody of a child, the establishment of at least one designated location for the exchange of the child; provides that, unless otherwise agreed by both parents in writing, the court may require the parents to exchange the child at a neutral safe exchange location; requires each sheriff to designate at least one parking lot at the sheriff’s office as a neutral safe exchange location at which parents with shared custody of a child may meet to exchange the child. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 8 and Title 36.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8, Chapter 8 and Title 36, relative to child custody.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2503 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee