TN SB2544 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-20 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prescribes certain contractual and reporting requirements to protect the integrity of financial transactions in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 12; Title 45 and Title 47.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 12; Title 45 and Title 47, relative to financial transaction integrity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-20 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/20/2024 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2802 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee