TN SB2744 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/11/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - Effective date(s) 04/11/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands a parent's right to unimpeded telephone conversations with the parent's child at least twice a week when the child is in the custody of the other parent to include video conference conversations, if available. - Amends TCA Title 14; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 14; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39; Title 49; Title 63 and Title 68, relative to parental rights.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Effective date(s) 04/11/2024 | |
2024-04-17 | Pub. Ch. 711 | |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2024-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2024-04-01 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2 |
2024-04-01 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2024-02-29 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 2/26/2024 |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/20/2024 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2024-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2945 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 711