TN SB2840 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, lengthens suspension of requirement that sole proprietors and partners maintain workers compensation insurance on themselves from March 28, 2011, until April 1, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 1, Chapter 3; Title 29; Title 39, Chapter 11; Title 50; Title 56 and Title 62.
Title
As introduced, lengthens suspension of requirement that sole proprietors and partners maintain workers compensation insurance on themselves from March 28, 2011, until April 1, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 1, Chapter 3; Title 29; Title 39, Chapter 11; Title 50; Title 56 and Title 62.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on S. C,L&A Comm. cal. for 03/16/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. C,L&A Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2844 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-28 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in: Consumer & Employees Affairs Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB2840&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/SB2840.pdf |