TN SB2899 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1141
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1141
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, redefines "eligible independent postsecondary institution" to include institutions that are members of an accrediting agency that is recognized by the U.S. department of education and the Council on Higher Education Accreditation; designates Knoxville College as an eligible independent postsecondary institution for purposes of lottery scholarships. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
As enacted, redefines "eligible independent postsecondary institution" to include institutions that are members of an accrediting agency that is recognized by the U.S. department of education and the Council on Higher Education Accreditation; designates Knoxville College as an eligible independent postsecondary institution for purposes of lottery scholarships. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-03 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-07 - Senate - S. ED. COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. FW&M Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1141 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 06/30/10 | |
2010-06-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-04 | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-04 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA1607) | |
2010-06-04 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA1606) | |
2010-06-04 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-06-04 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-06-04 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-04 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA1566) | |
2010-06-04 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA1565) | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 06/03/10 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 06/02/10 | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Action def. in S. FW&M Comm to 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Action def. in FW&M Com. to 5/27/10 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-04-07 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-04-07 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/07/2010 | |
2010-04-05 | Action Def. in S. Ed. Comm. to 4/7/2010 | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. Ed. Comm. cal. for 04/05/2010 | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-26 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3479 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1141