TN SB3029 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-01-30 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Pending: Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits impact fees or adequate facilities taxes from being imposed on age-exclusive developments for persons 55 and older if children as permanent residents are also excluded; clarifies present acts imposing impact fees and adequate facilities taxes may be revised to reduce the fee or tax or remove types of property from being subject to such fees or taxes. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-2913.
Title
As introduced, prohibits impact fees or adequate facilities taxes from being imposed on age-exclusive developments for persons 55 and older if children as permanent residents are also excluded; clarifies present acts imposing impact fees and adequate facilities taxes may be revised to reduce the fee or tax or remove types of property from being subject to such fees or taxes. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-2913.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-30 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2012-01-26 | Intro., P1C. | |
2012-01-25 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2921 (Crossfiled) 2012-03-21 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee of State & Local Government Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB3029&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB3029.pdf |