TN SB3135 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1113
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1113
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires the commissioner of revenue to offset any state tax refunds of $200 or more that are owed to a taxpayer by the amount of any debt that the taxpayer owes to a state agency or to any person on whose behalf a state agency acts to collect a debt; makes the present law system of submitting asset disclosure forms to inmates mandatory rather than discretionary; revises other provisions relating to tax refunds. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4; Title 18; Title 36, Chapter 5; Title 41, Chapter 21, Part 9; Title 49, Chapter 4; Title 50, Chapter 7; Title 67, Chapter 1 and Title 71, Chapter 5.
Title
As enacted, requires the commissioner of revenue to offset any state tax refunds of $200 or more that are owed to a taxpayer by the amount of any debt that the taxpayer owes to a state agency or to any person on whose behalf a state agency acts to collect a debt; makes the present law system of submitting asset disclosure forms to inmates mandatory rather than discretionary; revises other provisions relating to tax refunds. - Amends TCA Title 9, Chapter 4; Title 18; Title 36, Chapter 5; Title 41, Chapter 21, Part 9; Title 49, Chapter 4; Title 50, Chapter 7; Title 67, Chapter 1 and Title 71, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-05 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1113 | |
2010-06-09 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2010-06-07 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (1) cal. for 06/09/2010 | |
2010-06-05 | Placed on Sen. Regular Calendar (2) cal. for 06/05/2010 | |
2010-06-05 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 1 | |
2010-06-05 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/05/2010 | |
2010-06-04 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/4/2010 | |
2010-06-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/04/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Action def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 6/4/10 | |
2010-06-03 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/03/2010 | |
2010-06-02 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 06/03/10 | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/02/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Action def. in FW&M Comm to 06/02/10 | |
2010-05-28 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 06/01/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Action def. in S. FW&M Comm to 06/01/10 | |
2010-05-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/27/2010 | |
2010-05-27 | Action def. in FW&M Com. to 5/27/10 | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 05/26/2010 | |
2010-04-06 | Ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. w/o recommend | |
2010-04-01 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 04/06/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 03/30/2010 | |
2010-03-09 | Action def. in S. Tax Sub Comm. to next cal. | |
2010-03-04 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 03/09/2010 | |
2010-02-09 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2010-01-27 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-27 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3169 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1113