TN SB3385 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1125
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Pub. Ch. 1125
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a rule-making hearing be conducted for all permanent rules that were previously filed as emergency rules, unless the emergency rule was filed to avoid the loss of federal funds. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, requires a rule-making hearing be conducted for all permanent rules that were previously filed as emergency rules, unless the emergency rule was filed to avoid the loss of federal funds. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 5, Part 2.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Pub. Ch. 1125 | |
2010-07-06 | Effective date(s) 07/01/10 | |
2010-06-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2010-06-23 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2010-06-22 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2010-06-09 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2010-06-04 | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2010-06-04 | Subst. for comp. HB. | |
2010-04-01 | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. | |
2010-03-31 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2010-03-31 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2010-03-29 | Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (2) cal. for 03/31/2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on S. Govt. Ops. Comm. cal. for 03/24/2010 | |
2010-02-01 | P2C, ref. to S. Govt. Ops. Comm. | |
2010-01-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3475 (Crossfiled) 2010-07-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1125