TN SB8003 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 4
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes various changes to the law concerning the electronic delivery of health care and its coverage under certain insurance policies and TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Section 63-1-155.
Title
As enacted, makes various changes to the law concerning the electronic delivery of health care and its coverage under certain insurance policies and TennCare. - Amends TCA Title 56 and Section 63-1-155.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Paul Bailey [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] |
Sen. Art Swann [R] | Sen. Todd Gardenhire [R] | Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-12 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 4 | |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 8/12/2020 |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2020-08-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 8/12/2020 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 8/11/2020 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S Commerce & Labor Comm. 8-11-20 |
2020-08-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2020-08-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB8002 (Crossfiled) 2020-08-27 - Pub. Ch. 4