TX HB1106 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to providing certain information to a criminal defendant at the time the defendant is placed on deferred adjudication community supervision and at the time of the dismissal of certain proceedings against the defendant.
Title
Relating to providing certain information to a criminal defendant at the time the defendant is placed on deferred adjudication community supervision and at the time of the dismissal of certain proceedings against the defendant.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Johnson [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-19 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-18 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-16 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-16 | Record vote | |
2011-05-16 | Passed | |
2011-05-16 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-16 | Record vote | |
2011-05-16 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-16 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-16 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-16 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-13 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-12 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Criminal Justice | |
2011-04-20 | Read first time | |
2011-04-18 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-14 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-05 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-04 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-03-29 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
Courts--General
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Pretrial Procedure
DEFERRED ADJUDICATION
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION