TX HB1110 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-25 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-25 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the qualifications, duties, and limitations of Texas delegates to a convention called under Article V of the United States Constitution.
Title
Relating to the qualifications, duties, and limitations of Texas delegates to a convention called under Article V of the United States Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - HB 1110Third Reading House (Y: 134 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-25 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Tagged |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | House | Passed |
2015-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-05 | House | Amended |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-01 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-01 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select |
2015-03-02 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |