TX HB1114 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-09 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public school, child-placing agency, and day-care center policies addressing sexual abuse and other maltreatment of children.
Title
Relating to public school, child-placing agency, and day-care center policies addressing sexual abuse and other maltreatment of children.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] | Rep. Mark Shelton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-05-06 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-06 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-03 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-03 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-05-03 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-05-03 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | Filed |
Subjects
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Day Care
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Day Care
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING