TX HB1114 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority with whom certain political committees must file reports of political contributions and expenditures.
Title
Relating to the authority with whom certain political committees must file reports of political contributions and expenditures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - House - HB 1114Third Reading House (Y: 131 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 1114Third Reading House (Y: 125 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 1114Third Reading House (Y: 125 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/15 | |
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-26 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed |
2015-05-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-06 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-22 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to Elections |
2015-03-02 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BONDS
Education
Education--School Districts
Elections
Elections--Campaign Financing
Ethics
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS
Education
Education--School Districts
Elections
Elections--Campaign Financing
Ethics
ETHICS COMMISSION, TEXAS
POLITICAL CONTRIBUTIONS