TX HB1127 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 1/1/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 1/1/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to notice of relief available to certain members of the military required to be provided in certain real property documentation.
Title
Relating to notice of relief available to certain members of the military required to be provided in certain real property documentation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 1/1/12 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-23 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-21 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-21 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-21 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Record vote | |
2011-05-21 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-19 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-11 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-11 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to Veteran Affairs & Military Instal | |
2011-05-03 | Read first time | |
2011-04-27 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-27 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Passed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-26 | Record vote | |
2011-04-26 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | |
2011-04-26 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-26 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-20 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-19 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-14 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-04-14 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-14 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-07 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-07 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-31 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-02-03 | Filed |
Subjects
Military & Veterans
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Property Owners Association