TX HB1127 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of game rooms by certain counties; providing penalties; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the regulation of game rooms by certain counties; providing penalties; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Rep. Wayne Smith [R] | Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Patricia Harless [R] |
Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Allen Fletcher [R] | Rep. Ana Hernandez [D] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] |
Rep. Debbie Riddle [R] | Rep. Hubert Vo [D] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Sen. Dan Patrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - HB 1127Third Reading House (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - HB 1127Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - HB 1127Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2013-06-14 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-25 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-24 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2013-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-24 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-19 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-18 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-18 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-18 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-15 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-04 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-26 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2013-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Amusements, Games, Sports
County Government
County Government--General
Courts
Courts--District
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
County Government
County Government--General
Courts
Courts--District
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions