TX HB1127 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a franchise tax credit pilot program for taxable entities that employ certain apprentices.
Title
Relating to a franchise tax credit pilot program for taxable entities that employ certain apprentices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-15 | House | No action taken in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
UNITED MEXICAN STATES
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
Taxation
Taxation--Franchise
UNITED MEXICAN STATES