TX HB1135 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an application to run for political office.
Title
Relating to an application to run for political office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-19 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-09 | Referred to State Affairs | |
2011-05-09 | Read first time | |
2011-05-06 | Received from the House | |
2011-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | Passed | |
2011-05-05 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-04 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-05-04 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-27 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-04-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-21 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-21 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-04-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-04-18 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-04-18 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2011-04-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Elections | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | Filed |