TX HB1148 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exemption for certain disabled veterans from the payment of a fee for the issuance of a personal identification certificate.
Title
Relating to an exemption for certain disabled veterans from the payment of a fee for the issuance of a personal identification certificate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-26 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Passed | |
2011-05-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-24 | Record vote | |
2011-05-24 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-24 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-24 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-24 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-24 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-21 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2011-05-21 | Not again placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-04 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-04 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-26 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | |
2011-04-26 | Read first time | |
2011-04-19 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-18 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-18 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-18 | Record vote | |
2011-04-18 | Passed | |
2011-04-18 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-15 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-15 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-15 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-05 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-04-04 | Transferred to Calendars Committee | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-22 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-21 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-21 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-16 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-09 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-09 | No action taken in committee | |
2011-03-09 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Transportation | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
Military & Veterans
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
IDENTIFICATION CARDS
Military & Veterans
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Driver's Licenses