TX HB1311 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on February 17 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the transfer of certain state property from the Texas Department of Criminal Justice to Mitchell County.
Title
Relating to the transfer of certain state property from the Texas Department of Criminal Justice to Mitchell County.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-26 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-26 | Referred to Corrections | |
2009-02-26 | Read first time | |
2009-02-17 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1652 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
MITCHELL COUNTY
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
MITCHELL COUNTY
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources