TX HB1329 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-08 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration of oaths and issuance of subpoenas in an arbitration proceeding involving firefighters or police officers in certain political subdivisions; creating an offense.
Title
Relating to the administration of oaths and issuance of subpoenas in an arbitration proceeding involving firefighters or police officers in certain political subdivisions; creating an offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2013-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2013-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2013-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2013-02-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
OATHS
SUBPOENAS
City Government--Employees/Officers
County Government
County Government--Employees/Officers
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
MEDIATION, DISPUTE RESOLUTION, & ARBITRATION
OATHS
SUBPOENAS