TX HB1342 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-13 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the exchange of certain information between the Department of Family and Protective Services or certain foster care services contractors and a state or local juvenile justice agency.
Title
Relating to the exchange of certain information between the Department of Family and Protective Services or certain foster care services contractors and a state or local juvenile justice agency.
Sponsors
Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-12 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1330 (Similar To) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB1330 (Similar To) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB1330 (Similar To) 2023-03-16 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
FOSTER CARE
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
FOSTER CARE
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice