TX HB1364 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-05 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to referring children to local workforce development boards for subsidized child care services.
Title
Relating to referring children to local workforce development boards for subsidized child care services.
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Romero [D] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Rep. Christina Morales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-08 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-01 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-01 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to International Relations & Economic Development |
2021-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB971 (Same As) 2021-04-27 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT BOARDS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT BOARDS