TX HB1383 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-05 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to procedures in a criminal case after a defendant is found competent to stand trial and to consequences arising from certain violations of those procedures.
Title
Relating to procedures in a criminal case after a defendant is found competent to stand trial and to consequences arising from certain violations of those procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#925 (Y: 126 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#925 |
2023-05-03 | House | Passed |
2023-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2023-05-02 | House | Amended 1-Rose |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-11 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-11 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2023-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-10 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2023-04-04 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2023-03-03 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2023-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
JUDICIAL CONDUCT, STATE COMMISSION ON
Lawyers
MENTAL INCOMPETENCY
Courts--Judges
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
JUDICIAL CONDUCT, STATE COMMISSION ON
Lawyers
MENTAL INCOMPETENCY