TX HB1456 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Laid on the table subject to call
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-22 - Laid on the table subject to call
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Fort Bend-Waller Counties Municipal Utility District No. 2; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Fort Bend-Waller Counties Municipal Utility District No. 2; providing authority to impose a tax and issue bonds; granting a limited power of eminent domain.
Sponsors
Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2009-05-22 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-03-26 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-03-25 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-25 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-18 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | |
2009-03-17 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-17 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time | |
2009-02-19 | Transmitted to the Governor | |
2009-02-19 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB860 (Similar To) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
FORT BEND-WALLER COUNTIES MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT NO. 2
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Municipal Utility Districts
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility