TX HB1485 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-15 - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a grocery access investment fund program.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a grocery access investment fund program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-15 - House - HB 1485Third Reading House (Y: 64 N: 67 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2015-05-14 - House - HB 1485Third Reading House (Y: 71 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - HB 1485Third Reading House (Y: 71 N: 66 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-15 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2015-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-15 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-15 | House | Failed to pass |
2015-05-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-14 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2015-05-14 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-14 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-14 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-05-14 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-14 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-14 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-13 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-13 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-13 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-13 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-12 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2015-03-05 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-16 | House | Filed |