TX HB1545 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-04 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Commission on Jail Standards.
Title
Relating to the continuation and functions of the Commission on Jail Standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#586 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#586 (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-04 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-04 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-20 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-19 | House | Senate passage reported |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-30 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-30 | House | Record vote RV#586 |
2021-04-30 | House | Passed |
2021-04-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-01 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-30 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-25 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-25 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2021-03-11 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB710 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Committee report printed and distributed
Subjects
Corrections
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
JAIL STANDARDS, COMMISSION ON
Law Enforcement
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills
Corrections--Jails & Prisons
JAIL STANDARDS, COMMISSION ON
Law Enforcement
Sunset
Sunset--Commission Bills