TX HB1555 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the first day of instruction in certain school districts that provide additional days of instruction financed with local funds.
Title
Relating to the first day of instruction in certain school districts that provide additional days of instruction financed with local funds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-23 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-20 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2011-05-19 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2011-05-18 | Conf. Comm. Report distributed | |
2011-05-17 | Conference committee report filed | |
2011-05-09 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-09 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2011-05-09 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2011-05-09 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2011-05-06 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2011-05-06 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2011-05-06 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2011-05-05 | House appoints conferees | |
2011-05-05 | House requests conference committee | |
2011-05-05 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-05 | Record vote | |
2011-05-05 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-02 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-02 | Remarks ordered printed | |
2011-05-02 | Record vote | |
2011-05-02 | Passed | |
2011-05-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-02 | Record vote | |
2011-05-02 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-02 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-02 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-04-29 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-04-28 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-04-26 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-04-26 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-04-26 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-14 | Referred to Education | |
2011-04-14 | Read first time | |
2011-04-11 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-08 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-07 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-28 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-24 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-24 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Public Education | |
2011-03-03 | Read first time | |
2011-02-21 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
Education--School Districts