TX HB1627 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Environmental Regulation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of air quality permits for concrete plants located in certain areas.
Title
Relating to the issuance of air quality permits for concrete plants located in certain areas.
Sponsors
Rep. Senfronia Thompson [D] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. Jarvis Johnson [D] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] |
Rep. Penny Morales Shaw [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Environmental Regulation |
2021-03-09 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB368 (Similar To) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB1350 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
SB1350 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
Subjects
CEMENT & CONCRETE
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Environment
Environment--Air
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS