TX HB1766 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of private activity bonds for qualified residential rental projects.
Title
Relating to the issuance of private activity bonds for qualified residential rental projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective immediately | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Local Government |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Record vote RV#791 |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-05-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-02 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2023-04-28 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2023-04-25 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-07 | House | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services |
2023-03-07 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1651 (Same As) 2023-04-03 - Left pending in committee
SB1651 (Same As) 2023-04-03 - Left pending in committee
SB1651 (Same As) 2023-04-03 - Left pending in committee