TX HB18 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-9)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 1, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-9)
Status: Passed on June 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-02 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 1, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to consideration of the mental health of public school students in training requirements for certain school employees, curriculum requirements, counseling programs, educational programs, state and regional programs and services, and health care services for students and to mental health first aid program training and reporting regarding local mental health authority and school district personnel.
Title
Relating to consideration of the mental health of public school students in training requirements for certain school employees, curriculum requirements, counseling programs, educational programs, state and regional programs and services, and health care services for students and to mental health first aid program training and reporting regarding local mental health authority and school district personnel.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#362 (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Amended RV#338 (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#362 (Y: 129 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Amended RV#338 (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-02 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . December 1, 2019 | |
2019-06-02 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-15 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#362 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#338 |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-15 | House | Amended 2-Allison |
2019-04-15 | House | Amended 1-Price |
2019-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Public Health |
2019-02-27 | House | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB913 (Similar To) 2019-03-01 - Referred to Education
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
COUNSELING & THERAPY
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNET
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
COUNSELING & THERAPY
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Charter Schools
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Education--Primary & Secondary--Other School Personnel
Education--Primary & Secondary--Special
Education--Primary & Secondary--Teachers
Education--School Districts
EDUCATOR CERTIFICATION, STATE BOARD FOR
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
INTERNET
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STAFF DEVELOPMENT & TRAINING
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS