TX HB1926 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-27 - Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the extension of water or sewer service by certain retail public utilities at the request of a developer.
Title
Relating to the extension of water or sewer service by certain retail public utilities at the request of a developer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-04-06 | House | No action taken in committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2021-03-15 | House | Read first time |
2021-02-12 | House | Filed |