TX HB1969 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the issuance of certain permits for the movement of oversize or overweight vehicles on certain highways.
Title
Relating to the issuance of certain permits for the movement of oversize or overweight vehicles on certain highways.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-29 - House - HB 1969Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 1969Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-05 - House - HB 1969Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | See remarks for effective date | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-31 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-29 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2015-05-29 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2015-05-29 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-29 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2015-05-28 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2015-05-27 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-05 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-05 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-05 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-05-01 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-04-29 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-04-29 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-23 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-04-23 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2015-04-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-04-20 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-04-13 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-03-12 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BONDS
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
HIDALGO COUNTY
Highways
PERMITS
VEHICLE WEIGHT LIMITS & ENFORCEMENT
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
HIDALGO COUNTY
Highways
PERMITS
VEHICLE WEIGHT LIMITS & ENFORCEMENT