TX HB1977 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to encumbrances that may be fixed on homestead property.
Title
Relating to encumbrances that may be fixed on homestead property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-17 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-17 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-17 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-30 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-30 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-30 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Recalled from subcommittee | |
2009-03-09 | Subcommittee members named | |
2009-03-09 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | |
2009-03-05 | Referred to Business & Industry | |
2009-03-05 | Read first time | |
2009-02-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR76 (Enabling for) 2009-05-11 - Postponed
Subjects
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Property Owners Association
Property Interests--Homestead
Property Interests--Landlord & Tenant
Property Interests--Mortgages & Liens
Property Interests--Property Owners Association