TX HB2017 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to innovation waivers for certain insurance laws, regulations, and requirements; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to innovation waivers for certain insurance laws, regulations, and requirements; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-17 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2023-03-08 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2023-03-08 | House | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2340 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB2340 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Business & Commerce
SB2340 (Same As) 2023-03-23 - Referred to Business & Commerce